AL SJR12 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on 2/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on 2/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hubbert, Paul, commended
Title
Hubbert, Paul, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on 2/14/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned Act No. 2012-6. | |
2012-02-14 | Signature Requested | |
2012-02-14 | Enrolled | |
2012-02-14 | Passed Second House | |
2012-02-14 | Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-14 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-09 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2012-02-09 | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-09 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |