AL SJR24 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned Act No. 2019-31.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned Act No. 2019-31.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Congress, urged to grant additional authority to the Federal Communications Commission to stop robocalls and caller ID spoofing
Title
Congress, urged to grant additional authority to the Federal Communications Commission to stop robocalls and caller ID spoofing
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-31. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 3:17 p.m. on April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-04-04 | House | Jones (M) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from Rules |
2019-04-02 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Introduced |