AR HB1001 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Notification that HB1001 is now Act 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Notification that HB1001 is now Act 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Possession Of An Open Container Of Alcohol In A Motor Vehicle; And To Make Technical Corrections Necessary To Avoid Future Federal Highway Spending Penalties.
Title
Concerning The Possession Of An Open Container Of Alcohol In A Motor Vehicle; And To Make Technical Corrections Necessary To Avoid Future Federal Highway Spending Penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Notification that HB1001 is now Act 7 |
2018-03-15 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2018-03-15 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2018-03-15 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2018-03-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2018-03-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2018-03-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2018-03-12 | House | Filed |