AR HB1018 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Notification that HB1018 is now Act 824
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Notification that HB1018 is now Act 824
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Population Requirements That Control The Number Of Directors Who Serve On A School District Board Of Directors.
Title
To Amend The Population Requirements That Control The Number Of Directors Who Serve On A School District Board Of Directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Notification that HB1018 is now Act 824 |
2019-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2018-12-05 | House | Filed |