AR HB1020 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Out-of-state Teaching Experience To Be Considered When Determining A Teacher's Salary Schedule.
Title
To Allow Out-of-state Teaching Experience To Be Considered When Determining A Teacher's Salary Schedule.
Sponsors
Rep. Les Warren [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-01-31 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-29 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-01-29 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2018-12-05 | House | Filed |