AR HB1022 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Notification that HB1022 is now Act 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Notification that HB1022 is now Act 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Civil And Criminal Liability Of Mandated Reporters Who Act In Good Faith.
Title
Concerning The Civil And Criminal Liability Of Mandated Reporters Who Act In Good Faith.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Notification that HB1022 is now Act 186 |
2019-02-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-02-18 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-02-18 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-01-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-29 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-01-29 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2018-12-05 | House | Filed |