AR HB1052 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1052 is now Act 745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Professional Bail Bondsman Licensing Board Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Professional Bail Bondsman Licensing Board Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseNotification that HB1052 is now Act 745
2019-04-02HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-01HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-01HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-01SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-04-01SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-29SenateRe-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-01-23SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-01-23SenateReceived from the House.
2019-01-23HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-01-23HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-01-23HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-01-23HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-01-22HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2018-12-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback