AR HB1059 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-02 - House Notification that HB1059 is now Act 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-02 - House Notification that HB1059 is now Act 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow A Court To Extend The Duration Of A Temporary Guardianship In Certain Situations.
Title
To Allow A Court To Extend The Duration Of A Temporary Guardianship In Certain Situations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | House Notification that HB1059 is now Act 9 | |
2011-01-31 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-01-31 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-01-31 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-01-19 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-01-18 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-01-10 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-12-30 | House Prefiled |