AR HB1066 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The State Board Of Examiners Of Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Counselors Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The State Board Of Examiners Of Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Counselors Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
2019-01-31HouseNotification that HB1066 is now Act 44
2019-01-29HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-01-28HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-01-28HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-01-28SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-01-28SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-01-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-01-23SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-01-23SenateReceived from the House.
2019-01-23HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-01-23HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-01-23HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-01-23HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-01-22HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2018-12-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback