AR HB1082 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1082 is now Act 746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas State Claims Commission Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas State Claims Commission Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseNotification that HB1082 is now Act 746
2019-04-01HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-29HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-29HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-03-26HouseRe-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-03-26SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-26SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-25SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-02-04SenateRe-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-01-31SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-01-31SenateReceived from the House.
2019-01-31HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-01-29HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-01-02HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback