AR HB1122 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Notification that HB1122 is now Act 899
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Department Of Emergency Management Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Department Of Emergency Management Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseNotification that HB1122 is now Act 899
2019-04-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-04HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-04HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-04SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-04-04SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-03SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-04-03SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-03HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-03HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-02HouseRe-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-04-02HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-02HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-02HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-29HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-29HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-29HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2019-03-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-19HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-01-08HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback