AR HB1130 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Notification that HB1130 is now Act 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Notification that HB1130 is now Act 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The National Park College Appropriation For The 2017-2018 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The National Park College Appropriation For The 2017-2018 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Notification that HB1130 is now Act 106 |
2017-01-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-01-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-01-30 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-01-26 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-01-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-01-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2017-01-09 | House | Filed |