AR HB1130 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1130 is now Act 1007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Arkansas State Police Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Arkansas State Police Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseNotification that HB1130 is now Act 1007
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-09HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-09HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-04-09SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-08SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-04-08SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-08HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-08HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-04-08HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-04-05HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-05HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-05HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2019-03-12HouseRe-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-03-07HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-06HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback