AR HB1144 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1144 is now Act 748
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The State Military Department Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The State Military Department Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseNotification that HB1144 is now Act 748
2019-04-03HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-02HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-02HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-02SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-04-02SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-01SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-29HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-29HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-29HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-03-29HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-19HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-06HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-05HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-05HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-05HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback