AR HB1145 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Limit The Authority Of Local Governments To Pay Taxpayer Funds Under Service Contracts For Economic And Industrial Development Management Services.
Title
To Limit The Authority Of Local Governments To Pay Taxpayer Funds Under Service Contracts For Economic And Industrial Development Management Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nickels [D] | Rep. John Burris [R] | Rep. Sheilla Lampkin [D] | Sen. Greg Leding [D] |
Rep. Mark Lowery [R] | Rep. Stephen Meeks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-03-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-06 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2013-01-25 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1145 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1145.pdf |