AR HB1211 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Notification that HB1211 is now Act 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Notification that HB1211 is now Act 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require That Religious Organizations Are Protected During An Emergency; To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Require That Religious Organizations Are Protected During An Emergency; To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 10 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 10 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Notification that HB1211 is now Act 94 |
2021-02-04 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-02-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-02-03 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-01-28 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-01-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |