AR HB1221 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that HB1221 is now Act 780
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Supreme Court Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Supreme Court Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseNotification that HB1221 is now Act 780
2019-04-04HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-03HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-03HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-03SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-04-03SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-02SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-04-02SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-02HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-04-02HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-03-29HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-29HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-29HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
2019-03-12HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-12HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-12HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback