AR HB1357 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
To Promote Voter Turnout; And To Amend The Law To Limit The Dates On Which An Election Can Be Held.
Title
To Promote Voter Turnout; And To Amend The Law To Limit The Dates On Which An Election Can Be Held.
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Kerr [R] | Sen. David Sanders [R] | Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] | Rep. Mark Lowery [R] |
Rep. Mary L. Slinkard [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - The vote by which HB1357 Failed to Pass was expunged. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - Motion to reconsider HB1357 passed. (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 45 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - Motion to reconsider HB1357 passed. (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 45 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-04-11 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2013-04-10 | House | The vote by which HB1357 Passed was expunged. |
2013-04-10 | House | EXPUNGED |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned From the Senate as requested. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned To the House as requested. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Amendment # 1 and 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 and 2 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-12 | House | Motion to reconsider HB1357 passed. |
2013-03-12 | House | Rep. Wardlaw served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which HB 1357 failed to pass. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-03-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed |