AR HB1382 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]

Summary

To Exempt From Disclosure Under The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967 And Keep Confidential Records And Information Concerning A Lottery Winner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Exempt From Disclosure Under The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967 And Keep Confidential Records And Information Concerning A Lottery Winner.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 55 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 39 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-02SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-01HouseThe vote by which HB1382 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-04-01HouseMotion by Representative McCullum to expunge HB1382 vote passed
2019-03-28HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-25HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-25HouseAmendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-25HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-25HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-20HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-14HouseRe-referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2019-03-12HouseThe vote by which HB1382 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-03-12HouseMotion by Representatie Mark Lowery to expunge HB1382 vote passed
2019-03-12HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-03-07HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-07HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-07HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-06HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2019-02-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-28HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback