AR HB1387 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on HOUSE RULES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on HOUSE RULES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Require A Private Club Permit Applicant In A Dry Territory To Obtain The Approval Of The City Or County Governing Body.
Title
To Require A Private Club Permit Applicant In A Dry Territory To Obtain The Approval Of The City Or County Governing Body.
Sponsors
Sen. John Payton [R] | Sen. Eddie Williams [R] | Rep. Randy Alexander [R] | Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] |
Rep. Mark Biviano [R] | Rep. Ann Clemmer [R] | Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] | Rep. Dan Douglas [R] |
Rep. David Meeks [R] | Rep. Robert Dale [R] | Rep. Andy Davis [R] | Rep. Gary Deffenbaugh [R] |
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Rep. Charlene Fite [R] | Rep. Bill Gossage [R] | Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Rep. Justin Harris [R] | Rep. Debra Hobbs [R] | Rep. Andrea Lea [R] | Rep. Mark Lowery [R] |
Rep. Josh Miller [R] | Sen. Terry Rice [R] | Rep. Stephen Meeks [R] | Rep. Sue Scott [R] |
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R] | Rep. Richard Womack [R] | Rep. Tommy Wren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2013-04-18 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2013-03-11 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-11 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-11 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-26 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-26 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-26 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-19 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-19 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2013-02-15 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1387 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1387.pdf |