AR HB1396 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Right Of The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality And An Owner Or Operator To Access Property For Purposes Of Investigation, Site Assessment, Or Corrective Action.
Title
To Clarify The Right Of The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality And An Owner Or Operator To Access Property For Purposes Of Investigation, Site Assessment, Or Corrective Action.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Leding [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 45 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-02-28 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-02-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed |