AR HB1418 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 58-31-1)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 58-31-1)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
To Dedicate Sales And Use Tax Revenue From The Sales Of New And Used Vehicles In Part For Roadway Maintenance, Construction, And Reconstruction; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Dedicate Sales And Use Tax Revenue From The Sales Of New And Used Vehicles In Part For Roadway Maintenance, Construction, And Reconstruction; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-18 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-18 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-18 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1418 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1418.pdf |