AR HB1489 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Procedures For Petitions And Referred Constitutional Amendments; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Procedures For Petitions And Referred Constitutional Amendments; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-25 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2019-02-25 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-02-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-02-18 | House | Filed |