AR HB1580 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning An Arkansas Bovine Animal Disease Program And The Use Of The Livestock And Poultry Commission Disease And Pest Control Fund; And To Make Technical Corrections.
Title
Concerning An Arkansas Bovine Animal Disease Program And The Use Of The Livestock And Poultry Commission Disease And Pest Control Fund; And To Make Technical Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - The vote by which HB1580 Failed to Pass was expunged. (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 35 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 35 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-03-26 | House | The vote by which HB1580 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2013-03-26 | House | EXPUNGED |
2013-03-22 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-14 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2013-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-08 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2013-03-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2013-03-01 | House | Filed |