AR HB1636 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that HB1636 is now Act 507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that HB1636 is now Act 507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Certain Definitions That Apply To The Guaranteed Energy Cost Savings Act And Energy Savings Contracts.
Title
To Amend Certain Definitions That Apply To The Guaranteed Energy Cost Savings Act And Energy Savings Contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Notification that HB1636 is now Act 507 |
2019-03-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |