AR HB1683 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Criminal Offenses Regarding Elections.
Title
To Amend The Criminal Offenses Regarding Elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] | Sen. Alan Clark [R] | Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R] | Rep. John Catlett [D] |
Rep. Dan Douglas [R] | Rep. Robert Dale [R] | Rep. Mike Holcomb [R] | Rep. Lane Jean [R] |
Rep. Sue Scott [R] | Rep. Mary L. Slinkard [R] | Rep. John Vines [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-03-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1683 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1683.pdf |