AR HB1736 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal Or Amend Certain Obsolete Laws Concerning Business And Commercial Law Contained In Title 4 Of The Arkansas Code.
Title
To Repeal Or Amend Certain Obsolete Laws Concerning Business And Commercial Law Contained In Title 4 Of The Arkansas Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |