AR HB1752 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
The Arkansas Second Amendment Liberties Safeguards Act.
Title
The Arkansas Second Amendment Liberties Safeguards Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] | Sen. Jon Woods [R] | Rep. Randy Alexander [R] | Sen. Bryan King [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Barnett [R] | Rep. Nate Bell [R] | Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R] | Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] |
Rep. Robert Altes [R] | Rep. Dan Douglas [R] | Rep. David Meeks [R] | Rep. Andy Davis [R] |
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Rep. Joe Farrer [R] | Rep. Charlene Fite [R] | Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R] |
Rep. Justin Harris [R] | Rep. Debra Hobbs [R] | Rep. John Hutchison [R] | Sen. Jane English [R] |
Rep. Lane Jean [R] | Rep. Mark Lowery [R] | Rep. Josh Miller [R] | Sen. John Payton [R] |
Sen. Jason Rapert [R] | Rep. Stephen Meeks [R] | Rep. Sue Scott [R] | Rep. Richard Womack [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1752 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1752.pdf |