AR HB1772 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Increase The Individual Sewage Disposal Permit Fee.
Title
To Increase The Individual Sewage Disposal Permit Fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Douglas [R] | Sen. Jon Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-21 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-03-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |