AR HB1932 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Relating To The Rents, Fees, And Charges Of A Regional Solid Waste Management District Or Board.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Relating To The Rents, Fees, And Charges Of A Regional Solid Waste Management District Or Board.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Douglas [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-04 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |