AR HB1939 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Agenda Of A Regular Meeting Of A School District Board Of Directors.
Title
Concerning The Agenda Of A Regular Meeting Of A School District Board Of Directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned From the Senate having failed to pass. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned To the House as Having Failed to Pass. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read third time and failed to pass. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read third time and failed to pass. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |