AR HB1981 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend And Expand The Arkansas Central Business Improvement District Rehabilitation And Development Investment Tax Credit Act.
Title
To Amend And Expand The Arkansas Central Business Improvement District Rehabilitation And Development Investment Tax Credit Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-19 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2013-04-19 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2013-04-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-17 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-26 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-26 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-26 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1981 |
Text | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1981.pdf |