AR HB2004 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Full Payment Of Wages After Termination Of Employment.
Title
To Require Full Payment Of Wages After Termination Of Employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Leding [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |