AR HB2016 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Notice Required Before Filing A Mechanic's Or Materialman's Lien.
Title
To Clarify The Notice Required Before Filing A Mechanic's Or Materialman's Lien.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-14 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-11 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |