AR HB2017 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Be Known As The Nonpartisan Law Enforcement Act Of 2013.
Title
To Be Known As The Nonpartisan Law Enforcement Act Of 2013.
Sponsors
Rep. Nate Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-04-17 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2013-03-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-25 | House | Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-25 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB2017 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB2017.pdf |