AR HB2107 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Workers' Compensation Law Enacted By Initiated Act 4 Of 1948 And To Revise Third-party Liability In The Workers' Compensation Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Workers' Compensation Law Enacted By Initiated Act 4 Of 1948 And To Revise Third-party Liability In The Workers' Compensation Law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2013-03-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-27HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-20HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2013-03-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback