AR HB2278 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that HB2278 is now Act 1513
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that HB2278 is now Act 1513
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Membership And Duties Of The Arkansas Coalition For Juvenile Justice Board.
Title
Concerning The Membership And Duties Of The Arkansas Coalition For Juvenile Justice Board.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R] | Sen. Jeremy Hutchinson [R] | Rep. Eddie Armstrong [D] | Rep. Henry Wilkins [D] |
Sen. Jon Woods [R] | Rep. Marshall Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Notification that HB2278 is now Act 1513 |
2013-04-23 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-23 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-23 | House | Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from the Governor as requested. |
2013-04-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-18 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-18 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 and 2. |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 and 2. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-16 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read third time and failed to pass. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-06 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2013-04-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |