AR HCR1005 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing The One Hundredth Anniversary Of The Subiaco Academy Alumni Association.
Title
Recognizing The One Hundredth Anniversary Of The Subiaco Academy Alumni Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor. |
2013-04-11 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-10 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-09 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCR1005 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HCR1005.pdf |