AR HCR1010 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize That Abuse And Neglect Of Children Is A Significant Public Health Problem; To Commend The Important Work Being Done To Combat The Problem; And To Proclaim April 11, 2019, As “children’s Advocacy Center Day”.
Title
To Recognize That Abuse And Neglect Of Children Is A Significant Public Health Problem; To Commend The Important Work Being Done To Combat The Problem; And To Proclaim April 11, 2019, As “children’s Advocacy Center Day”.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-03 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House as concurred in as amended. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-01 | Senate | ORDERED ENGROSSED |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-14 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed |