AR HJR1009 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
The Arkansas Elected Officials Ethics, Transparency, And Financial Reform Amendment Of 2014.
Title
The Arkansas Elected Officials Ethics, Transparency, And Financial Reform Amendment Of 2014.
Sponsors
Rep. Warwick Sabin [D] | Sen. Jon Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Approved by the Governor. |
2013-04-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-19 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-19 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as concurred in as amended #1 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Held in Chamber |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-09 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-04-09 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-06 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended #3 |
2013-04-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-03 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed |