AR HMR1003 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Remembering John Phillip Carroll And His Contributions To The Nation, The State Of Arkansas, And His Local Community.
Title
Remembering John Phillip Carroll And His Contributions To The Nation, The State Of Arkansas, And His Local Community.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-19 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-19 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HMR1003 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HMR1003.pdf |