AR HR1002 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Urge The Activation Of Closed Captioning On Television Monitors In Public Venues.
Title
To Urge The Activation Of Closed Captioning On Television Monitors In Public Venues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2021-01-25 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2020-11-18 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hr1002&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HR1002/HR1002111820201020.pdf |