AR HR1042 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Remembering Officer William Mcgary And Commending His Contributions To His Local Community And The State Of Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remembering Officer William Mcgary And Commending His Contributions To His Local Community And The State Of Arkansas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-10HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2013-04-03HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-03-22HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-22HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-22HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2013-03-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback