AR HR1042 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing And Finding That The Proliferation And Accessibility Of Pornography Has Created A Public Health Crisis Leading To A Broad Spectrum Of Individual And Public Health Impacts And Societal Harms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing And Finding That The Proliferation And Accessibility Of Pornography Has Created A Public Health Crisis Leading To A Broad Spectrum Of Individual And Public Health Impacts And Societal Harms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2017-03-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-27HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-22HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2017-03-14HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2017-03-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-14HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-06HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback