AR SB1 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Defenses To Prosecution For A Violation Of Operating An All-terrain Vehicle Upon A Public Street Or Highway; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Defenses To Prosecution For A Violation Of Operating An All-terrain Vehicle Upon A Public Street Or Highway; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Teague [D] | Rep. Mary Bentley [R] | Rep. Sarah Capp [R] | Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R] |
Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R] | Rep. Deann Vaught [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Notification that SB1 is now Act 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2018-03-15 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2018-03-15 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2018-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2018-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2018-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2018-03-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Filed |