AR SB10 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-29 - Notification that SB10 is now Act 4
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-29 - Notification that SB10 is now Act 4
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer Supplemental Appropriation.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer Supplemental Appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-29 | Senate | Notification that SB10 is now Act 4 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-01-24 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-01-24 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-01-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-01-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2013-01-23 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Filed |