AR SB107 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit The Issuance Or Renewal Of A Support Of Law Enforcement Special License Plate To Persons With Certain Criminal Histories.
Title
To Prohibit The Issuance Or Renewal Of A Support Of Law Enforcement Special License Plate To Persons With Certain Criminal Histories.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-03-12 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-03-11 | House | The vote by which SB107 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2019-03-11 | House | Motion by Representative Pilkington to expunge SB107 vote passed |
2019-03-11 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-02-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Filed |