AR SB1140 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Use Revenue From A Wine Excise Tax To Promote Research Concerning The Production Of Arkansas Wine And Arkansas Wine Grapes; And To Promote Agritourism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Use Revenue From A Wine Excise Tax To Promote Research Concerning The Production Of Arkansas Wine And Arkansas Wine Grapes; And To Promote Agritourism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17SenateSine Die adjournment
2013-05-17HouseReturned to the Senate.
2013-05-17HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2013-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2013-03-13HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-03-13SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-03-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-12SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback