AR SB128 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The University Of Arkansas - Poultry Science Department - Study Of Benefits Of Lignite Infused Poultry Water Appropriation For The 2012-2013 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The University Of Arkansas - Poultry Science Department - Study Of Benefits Of Lignite Infused Poultry Water Appropriation For The 2012-2013 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 47 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Returned From the House as Having Failed to Pass. | |
2012-03-01 | House Returned To the Senate having failed to pass. | |
2012-02-28 | House Read the third time and failed. | |
2012-02-27 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2012-02-27 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2012-02-27 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2012-02-23 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Filed |