AR SB162 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB162 is now Act 1399
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB162 is now Act 1399
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Address Employer Contributions Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Address Employer Contributions Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - House - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 57 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 58 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - House - Motion to rerefer SB 162 failed. (Y: 29 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 58 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - House - Motion to rerefer SB 162 failed. (Y: 29 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Notification that SB162 is now Act 1399 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned from the House as Passed, Emergency Clause having Failed of Adoption |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned to the Senate as passed, having failed the Emergency Clause |
2013-04-06 | House | Without objection, SB162 ordered not to transmit. |
2013-04-06 | House | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2013-04-06 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-06 | House | Motion to rerefer SB 162 failed. |
2013-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2013-03-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed |